Musacco v. Franco et al
Petitioner: Beau James Musacco
Respondent: German Franco and Attorney General State of New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2014cv00683
Filed: August 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ADOPTING 71 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Martha Vazquez DENYING 62 MOTION for Relief from the Judgement re 58 Order and 57 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations filed by Beau James Musacco; and DENYING 64 Motion for Order filed by Beau James Musacco. Wherefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Wormuth's Rule 60(b)(6) PFRD (doc. 71 ) is ADOPTED in full. Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment re: Final Order and Order Adopting Report and Recommendations (doc. 62 ) and his Motion for an Order granting the aforementioned motion (doc. 64 ) are DENIED. (gr)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION re 62 MOTION for Relief from the Judgment and re 64 MOTION for Order to Grant Petitioner's Motion for Relief from the Judgment filed by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Objections to PFRD due by 11/13/2020.(ceo)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Martha Vazquez re 1 Petition for 2254 Relief filed by Beau James Musacco. Wherefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition (doc. 55 ) is ADOPTED. Petitioner's claims based on evidentiary rulings, ineffective assistance of trial counsel, and sufficiency of evidence are DISMISSED with prejudice. (gr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musacco v. Franco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Beau James Musacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: German Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?