Hernandez v. City of Albuquerque et al
Plaintiff: Alfonso Hernandez
Defendant: City of Albuquerque, Andy Fitzgerald, Akeem Powdrell, Daniel Galvan and Amy Markwick
Case Number: 1:2014cv00964
Filed: October 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 322 Unopposed Motion to Remand to State Court. (tah)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales grants in part 312 Motion for Review by the Court of Clerk's Order Settling Costs. (tah)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER SETTING EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Motion related to the 310 Clerk's Order Settling Costs is due by 8/22/2019. Any response to such a motion is due by 8/27/2019. (tah)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 FINAL PRE-TRIAL ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part 212 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Contained in City of Albuquerque Records. (tah)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 2/20/2019 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion to Take Deposition; denying in part and reserving in part 151 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion to Strike; denying in part as moot 154 Motion to Strike; denying in part and reserving in part 156 Motion in Limine; denying in part and reserving in part 158 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 159 Motion in Limine. (tah)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 FOURTH AMENDED ORDER SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTIONS HEARING by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Status Conference reset for 1/30/2019 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTIONS HEARING by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Status Conference/Motions Hearingset for 1/24/2019 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 149 Defendant Fitzgerald's Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 153 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Andy Fitzgerald on Count VII. (tah)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 AMENDED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales resetting telephonic status conference for 1/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 1/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 6/11/2018 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying without prejudice 22 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1: To Exclude Testimony or Evidence of Prior Civil Cases, Prior "Propensity to Get into Physical Altercations," Prior Allegations against Employees of the City of Albuquerque, and Other Irrelevant Testimony or Evidence. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. City of Albuquerque et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Hernandez
Represented By: Anna C. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Represented By: Trisha A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jonlyn M Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akeem Powdrell
Represented By: Patricia Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Galvan
Represented By: Trisha A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Markwick
Represented By: Trisha A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?