Joshi Technologies International, Inc. v. Chi Operating, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joshi Technologies International, Inc.
Defendant: Chi Operating, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00467
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER to Submit Closing Documents by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Closing documents are due to the Court no later than 11/12/2019. (ead) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (nr).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Resetting Deadlines for Settlement Statements by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 AMENDED ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 8/30/2019 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The order is amended as to the date only. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SECOND ORDER REINSTATING SPECIAL MASTER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 7/29/2019 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/10/2019 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference l ine at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] A Settlement Conference is set for 10/24/2019 at 9:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 7/16/2019 at 02:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 131 Chi's Opposed Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Rulings. (tah)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 127 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (tah)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 2/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER APPROVING BUDGET PROPOSED BY SPECIAL MASTER-PHASE 2 by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER REINSTATING SPECIAL MASTER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting deadlines. Objections to Special Master's Report (Doc. 105) due 1/14/2019; motions for summary judgment due 2/28/2019. (tah)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 12/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales correcting bench trial date. (tah)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as a result of the telephonic status conference held today. (tah)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 10/18/2018 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 10/18/2018 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 10/11/2018 at 01:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at (505) 348-2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF SPECIAL MASTER'S INVOICES by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales approving 98 Budget Proposed by Special Master. (tah)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER OF REFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales detailing the Special Master's term of appointment, the scope of his duties, his authority, and his compensation. (tah)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER SELECTING AND APPOINTING THE SPECIAL MASTER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 12/18/2017 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 12/4/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made (atc)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 10/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER VACATING TRIAL SETTING by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 50 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Reopen Discovery and for Leave to Propound Supplemental Discovery to Defendant and Extend the Deadlines to Add or Substitute Additional Parties. (tah)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Vacating the September 13, 2017 settlement conference by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing set for 9/5/17 by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Resetting Hearing on 50 Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Reopen Discovery and and Extend the Deadlines to Add or Substitute Additional Parties by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Telephonic Motion Hearing is reset for 9/5/2017 at 02 :30 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule and Setting Hearing on Plaintiff's 50 Opposed Expedited Motion to Reopen Discovery. The Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for 9/1/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrat e Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Settlement Conference is set for 9/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 2nd Floor Conference Rooms 1 and 2 before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 8/15/2017 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [The parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joshi Technologies International, Inc. v. Chi Operating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshi Technologies International, Inc.
Represented By: Derek V Larson
Represented By: Keith C. Mier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Operating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?