Chavez v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Levi M Chavez
Defendant: Aaron Jones, Board of County Commissioners for Valencia County New Mexico, Juan Julian, Richard Pera, Renee Rivera and John Gordon
Case Number: 1:2015cv00619
Filed: July 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SUMMARY ORDER RESULTING FROM STATUS CONFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 4/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Aaron Jones by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 42 Opposed Motion Requestingan Order Allowing the Plaintiff to Depose James Mowduk and File a Response to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Doc 35 Thereafter or in the Alternative an Order Allowing the Plaintiff to File a Response Out of Time. Response due 8/29/2017. Reply due 9/12/2017. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi M Chavez
Represented By: Hans William Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for Valencia County New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?