Sanderson v. Desert Hills of New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: Sherrie Sanderson
Defendant: Desert Hills of New Mexico, Acadia Healthcare, Inc., Maria Santillanes and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2015cv00849
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Vacating the October 10, 2017 status conference, and the October 17, 2017 settlement conference by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/10/2017 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. A Settlement Conference is set for 10/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom, before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for 10/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (sls)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Settlement Conference set for 10/11/2017 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque, New Mexico (courtroom to be determined at a later date). (atc)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2017. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. The Court will initiate the call. (atc)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Her Complaint. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is to be filed on the docket within 5 working days of the entry of this Order. (baw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderson v. Desert Hills of New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Sanderson
Represented By: Brian T Gaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Hills of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Santillanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?