Williamson v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Teresa Williamson
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv00958
Filed: October 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter re admissibility of Plaintiff's Exhibit 11. (mlt)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting in part and denying in part 201 Motion in Limine (mlt)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera DENYING 165 Plaintiff's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Post Hoc Medical Testimony; DENYING 166 Plaintiff's Second Motion in Limine to Exclude Pre-Accident Medical Records; DENYING 167 Plaintiff's Third Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Previous Litigation; and GRANTING 169 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Collateral Source Payments. (baw)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera granting 145 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Replace Plaintiffs Expert Witness.Defendant will have until March 23, 2018 to take the deposition of expert Dr. Thomas Grace. Any motions related to the testimony of expert Dr. Thomas Grace must be filed by April 20, 2018.. (baw)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera granting in part and denying in part 111 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Insurance Expert Ray Padilla and 112 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Limit Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Brian Shelley, M.D. (baw)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera Granting 133 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Questions to the New Mexico Supreme Court; Denying 131 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Questions to the New Mexico Supreme Court; Denying 9 Plaintiff's First Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Count IIBreach of Fiduciary Duty); Dismissing Count IIBreach of Fiduciary Duty with prejudice; Denying 12 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Count VViolation of Unfair Practices Act); Denying 102 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Grounds of Plaintiffs Breach of Insurance Policy by Fraud. (baw)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera DENYING 56 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Dr. Slaughter Affidavits (Doc. 46-1 & 47-1), 95 Plaintiff's Third Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Count II - Breach of Fiduciary Duty), and 53 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Willful and Bad Faith Discovery Violations and Authorities in Support. (baw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Williamson
Represented By: Phillip P. Baca
Represented By: Thomas J. Mescall II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Headrick
Represented By: James H. Johansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?