Albuquerque Facility, LLC v. Danielson et al
Plaintiff: Albuquerque Facility, LLC
Defendant: Kraig Danielson, Corban Capital Partners, Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Financial Group, LLC and Corban Capital II
Case Number: 1:2015cv01033
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Presiding Judge: M Christina Armijo
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 FINAL ORDER by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. (vv)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #95 and dismissing case by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. (vv)
April 10, 2017 Filing 95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Objections to R&R due by 4/24/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (cda)
April 10, 2017 Filing 94 Letter by Kraig Danielson dated 4/7/2017. (cda)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #91 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting #92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; and finding as moot #77 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Attorney Patrick Joseph Rogers and David H. Stotts terminated. (cda)
February 15, 2017 Filing 92 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Capital Partners, Corban Financial Group, LLC, Kraig Danielson. (Rogers, Patrick)
February 14, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION to Withdraw by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Stotts, David)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER STAYING CASE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. The case is stayed until the Court rules on the pending Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff (Doc. 77). [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp)
December 20, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Capital Partners, Corban Financial Group, LLC re #77 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Corban Capital Partners, Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Financial Group, LLC, Kraig Danielson (Rogers, Patrick)
December 19, 2016 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Capital Partners, Corban Financial Group, LLC, Kraig Danielson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Rogers, Patrick)
December 16, 2016 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corban ABQ V LLC Additional Documents (Rogers, Patrick)
December 15, 2016 Filing 86 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Robert C. Brack no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack granting #80 Motion to Disqualify Judge (yc)
December 7, 2016 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Facility, LLC (Stotts, David)
December 5, 2016 Filing 83 MOTION to Compel by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Stotts, David)
December 5, 2016 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Facility, LLC (Stotts, David)
December 5, 2016 Filing 81 RESPONSE to Motion re #77 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J) (Stotts, David)
December 5, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Stotts, David)
November 30, 2016 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Capital Partners, Corban Financial Group, LLC, Kraig Danielson Second Discovery to Plaintiff (Rogers, Patrick)
November 30, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE Re: Remittal of Disqualification, by United States District Judge Robert C. Brack (jjs)
November 28, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Capital Partners, Corban Financial Group, LLC, Kraig Danielson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Rogers, Patrick)
November 18, 2016 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corban ABQ V LLC Deposition Notices (Rogers, Patrick)
November 14, 2016 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Facility, LLC (Stotts, David)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing finding as moot #68 Motion for Protective Order; finding as moot #69 Motion for Discovery; finding as moot #69 ORDER on Motion to Extend. Scheduling order deadlines are extended: Discovery due 12/30/16, Pretrial Motions due 2/2/17, Pretrial Order due to Court 5/15/17. (ccp)
October 20, 2016 Filing 73 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Discovery Hearing held on 10/20/2016. Attorney David Stotts appeared on behalf of plaintiff. Attorney Patrick Rogers appeared on behalf of defendants. The Court will enter an order extending the scheduling order deadlines and ruling on the pending discovery motions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp)
October 19, 2016 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Extend (other) filed by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Capital Partners, Corban Financial Group, LLC, Kraig Danielson. (Rogers, Patrick)
October 19, 2016 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Capital Partners, Corban Financial Group, LLC, Kraig Danielson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M) (Rogers, Patrick)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Discovery Hearing re #68 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Albuquerque Facility, LLC, and #69 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Extend (other) filed by Albuquerque Facility, LLC, for 10/20/2016 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
October 13, 2016 Filing 69 MOTION for Discovery , MOTION to Extend (other) by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Stotts, David)
October 12, 2016 Filing 68 MOTION for Protective Order by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhbit H) (Stotts, David)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #66 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Other Deadlines in the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/30/2016. Motions due by 1/3/2017. Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2017. (ccp)
October 6, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Stotts, David)
September 30, 2016 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corban ABQ V LLC Discovery and Deposition Notices to Plaintiff (Rogers, Patrick)
August 29, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 03/27/2017 through 03/29/2017, is VACATED and RE-SET to 08/14/2017, through 08/16/2017, (approximately three (3) days), at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 29, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 02/24/2017, is VACATED and RE-SET to 07/14/2017, at 08:45 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by calling Judge Brack's 'meet me' line a few minutes before the time scheduled for the Pretrial Conference. Should you choose this conference method, please contact Chambers). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 29, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 01/27/2017, is VACATED and RE-SET to 06/02/2017, at 08:45 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by calling Judge Brack's 'meet me' line a few minutes before the time scheduled for the Pretrial Conference. Should you choose this conference method, please contact Chambers). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #59 Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines. (ccp)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 **FILED IN ERROR** ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #59 Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery due by 10/13/16. Motions due by 12/1/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2017. (ccp) Modified on 8/25/2016 (dmw).
August 24, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Errata Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Errata Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H) (Stotts, David)
August 22, 2016 Filing 58 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #52 Order to Show Cause. Mail sent to Corban Entities (jn)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER TO QUASH #52 Order to Show Cause by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. The Court ordered the Corban entities to show cause why they should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with the Court's order to secure counsel by June 20, 2016. On July 22, 2016, attorney Patrick Rogers entered an appearance on behalf of the Corban entities. Doc. 53. On August 1, 2016, the Corban entities filed a written response to the Order to Show Cause. Doc. 54. The Corban entities have fulfilled the requirements in the Order to Show Cause to the Court's satisfaction and no sanctions will be imposed at this time. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
August 2, 2016 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Financial Group, LLC re #52 Order to Show Cause Discovery Responses, Response to Order to Show Cause (Rogers, Patrick)
August 1, 2016 Filing 54 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Financial Group, LLC (Rogers, Patrick)
July 22, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Joseph Rogers on behalf of Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Capital Partners, Corban Financial Group, LLC (Rogers, Patrick)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2016. (cda)
June 23, 2016 Filing 51 Clerk's Minutes for Status Conference held on 6/22/2016 before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (Court Reporter Liberty) (cda)
June 21, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Kraig Danielson, as a corporate representative, is instructed to attend the telephonic status conference scheduled for 6/22/2016 at 03:00 PM. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
June 21, 2016 Filing 49 Letter by Kraig Danielson dated 6/21/2016. (cda)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. In light of correspondence received today from Kraig Danielson, #47 , the deadline for the Corban entities to respond to discovery requests and submit a privilege log as previously ordered by this Court #41 is vacated and will be reset at the status conference scheduled for 6/22/16 at 3:00 p.m. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
June 13, 2016 Filing 47 Letter by Kraig Danielson to the Court dated 6/13/16. (cda)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED #41 Order Granting Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. As counsel for defendants has withdrawn, the parties are no longer required to submit a stipulated proposed confidentiality order by 5/23/2016. The deadline for submitting a proposed confidentiality order will be determined at the 6/22/2016 status conference. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Status Conference for 6/22/2016 at 03:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Spencer L. Edelman and Douglas R. Vadnais terminated. New counsel for defendants Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Capital Partners, Corban Financial Group, LLC, must enter an appearance no later than 6/20/16. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
May 17, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Capital Partners, Corban Financial Group, LLC. (Edelman, Spencer)
May 17, 2016 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Facility, LLC (Stotts, David)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #35 Motion to Compel. (cda)
May 11, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Albuquerque Facility, LLC re #35 MOTION to Compel filed by Albuquerque Facility, LLC (Stotts, David)
May 3, 2016 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Compel filed by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Stotts, David)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery due by 9/30/2016. Motions due 11/1/2016. Pretrial Order due 12/30/2016. (cda)
May 2, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Stotts, David)
April 25, 2016 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Compel filed by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - C)(Edelman, Spencer)
April 8, 2016 Filing 35 MOTION to Compel by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Stotts, David)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack GRANTING #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (yc)
March 24, 2016 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Facility, LLC (Stotts, David)
March 21, 2016 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Financial Group, LLC 's Responses and Objections to Albuquerque Facility's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Edelman, Spencer)
March 21, 2016 Filing 31 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Settlement Conference held on 3/18/2016. Case did not settle. (ccp)
February 17, 2016 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Stotts, David) Modified text on 2/18/2016 (yc).
February 17, 2016 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Stotts, David) Modified text on 2/18/2016 (yc).
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas D. Walker terminated. (cda)
February 8, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Kraig Danielson re #15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Kraig Danielson filed by Kraig Danielson (Walker, Thomas)
February 8, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 03/27/2017, through 03/29/2017, (approximately three (3) days), at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 02/24/2017, at 08:30 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by calling Judge Brack's 'meet me' line a few minutes before the time scheduled for the Pretrial Conference. Should you choose this conference method, please contact Chambers.)(ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 01/27/2017, at 08:30 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by calling Judge Brack's 'meet me' line a few minutes before the time scheduled for the Pretrial Conference. Should you choose this conference method, please contact Chambers.)(ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a Settlement Conference for 3/18/2016 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 340 Pecos Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 6/30/2016. Motions due by 8/1/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/30/2016. (cda)
February 2, 2016 Filing 20 Clerk's Minutes for Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 2/1/2016 before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
January 29, 2016 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Financial Group, LLC 's Initial Disclosures (Edelman, Spencer)
January 28, 2016 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Facility, LLC (Stotts, David)
January 25, 2016 Filing 17 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Corban ABQ V LLC (Edelman, Spencer)
January 20, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw Motion , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Kraig Danielson by Kraig Danielson. (Walker, Thomas)
January 15, 2016 Filing 15 **FILED IN ERROR** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Kraig Danielson by Kraig Danielson. (Roybal, Samuel) Modified on 1/20/2016 (jn).
December 14, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Kraig Danielson re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kraig Danielson (Walker, Thomas)
December 10, 2015 Filing 13 REPLY re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kraig Danielson. (Walker, Thomas)
November 25, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dc)
November 24, 2015 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
November 23, 2015 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Albuquerque Facility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Stotts, David)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 2/1/2016 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (ccp)
November 13, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Consents due 11/23/2015. (am)
November 12, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kraig Danielson. (Walker, Thomas)
November 12, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas D. Walker on behalf of Kraig Danielson (Walker, Thomas)
November 12, 2015 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to Chief United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mr)
November 12, 2015 Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen and U.S. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (mr)
November 12, 2015 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Financial Group, LLC (Edelman, Spencer)
November 12, 2015 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Financial Group, LLC. (Vadnais, Douglas)
November 12, 2015 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-4302752 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II, Corban Financial Group, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Edelman, Spencer)
November 12, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Corban Financial Group, LLC, Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II from Second Judicial District New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2015-07767. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Corban Financial Group, LLC, Corban ABQ V LLC, Corban Capital II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Edelman, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albuquerque Facility, LLC v. Danielson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraig Danielson
Represented By: Thomas D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corban Capital Partners
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Rogers
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Represented By: Douglas R. Vadnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corban ABQ V LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Rogers
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Represented By: Douglas R. Vadnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corban Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Rogers
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Represented By: Douglas R. Vadnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corban Capital II
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Rogers
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Represented By: Douglas R. Vadnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albuquerque Facility, LLC
Represented By: David H. Stotts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?