Foster v. Nova Hardbanding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jarrod B Foster
Defendant: Nova Hardbanding, LLC and Ken Brombley
Case Number: 1:2015cv01047
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 108 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 106 Joint Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting in part 102 Motion to Stay and Order to Submit Closing Documents by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 84 Defendants' Motion to Compel. (atc)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 86 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Defendants must file their Amended Answers by 1/24/17. (mhr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Nova Hardbanding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrod B Foster
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Apodaca
Represented By: James M. Loren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Hardbanding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Brombley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?