Sedillo Electric et al v. Colorado Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sedillo Electric and Telesfor Sedillo
Defendant: Colorado Casualty Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company and Baker Insurance Services, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2015cv01172
Filed: December 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Valencia
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Brack
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch IMPOSING SANCTIONS as to Eric Sedillo Jeffries. (mej)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack granting 137 MOTION to Bifurcate Plaintiffs' Contract Claims From Their Extracontractual Claims at Trial; It Is Further Ordered that the Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees and costs is denied. (jn)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. See also 251 . Plaintiffs' counsel SHALL appear in person. (mej)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch Granting Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Third Motion to Compel 218 and Defendants' Motion for Protective Order 242 . (mej)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. Reply to 218 due 12:00p.m. 4/3/2017; Response to 242 due 12:00p.m. 4/3/2017; Reply to 242 due 5:00p.m. 4/4/2017. (mej)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack DENYING 118 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Partial Judgment on the Pleadings on Amended Complaint and Supporting Authority [1:15cv01172, Doc.13]. (yc)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion to Compel. (mej)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sedillo Electric et al v. Colorado Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedillo Electric
Represented By: Eric Sedillo Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telesfor Sedillo
Represented By: Eric Sedillo Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Shannon A. Parden
Represented By: Jeff Ray
Represented By: Shona L. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Shannon A. Parden
Represented By: Jeff Ray
Represented By: Shona L. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Insurance Company
Represented By: Shannon A. Parden
Represented By: Jeff Ray
Represented By: Shona L. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Insurance Services, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?