Vigil v. New Mexico Public Education Department
Plaintiff: Norman Vigil
Defendant: New Mexico Public Education Department
Case Number: 1:2016cv00047
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 147 Unopposed Motion for Extension on Page Limits. (tah)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 84 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Counts I, III and V; granting 86 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Counts II, III and IV; and denying 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (tah)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (Correcting typo on page 8 in the first sentence of the Conclusion only.) (tah)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Court RECOMMENDS that 15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First, Second and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Based on Exhaustion Defect s be GRANTED as outlined in the PF&RD. Objections to PF&RD due by 1/18/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (mhr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigil v. New Mexico Public Education Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Vigil
Represented By: A. Nathaniel Chakeres
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Public Education Department
Represented By: Laurie A. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?