Thymes v. Verizon Wireless, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carl Gene Thymes
Defendant: Verizon Wireless, Inc. and Carlos Restrepo
Case Number: 1:2016cv00066
Filed: January 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. See ORDER for details. (mej)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part 155 Notice of Motion and Motion for Continuance to Oppose Summary Judgment Motion by Verizon Wireless, Inc Under Rule 56(D)(F) Relief and Affidavit (Docs 154, 153, 135,, 139). (tah)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch re 158 Response filed by Carl Gene Thymes to 156 Order on Motion to Compel. (mej)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch: granting 100 Motion to Compel; granting 101 Motion to Compel; denying 112 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 146 Motion to Compel; denying 153 Motion for Settlement Conference. Show Cause Response due 4/21/2017 by 5:00 p.m. (mej)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 83 "Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Recusal of Trial Judge Kenneth Gonzales for Cause Denying Apperances on the Record which Invites Corruption, Boycott and Stay of Trial Judge Orders Pending Appeal if Necessary (Doc. 58, 73)"; and denying the parties' respective requests for an award of attorneys fees and/or costs. (tah)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING re 136 MOTION to Quash and Memorandum to Quash Subpoenas and for Protective Order filed by Verizon Wireless, Inc. Response due 3/6/2017. Reply due 5:00 PM 3/7/2017. (mej)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch re 129 MOTION for Order filed by Carl Gene Thymes. Response due by NOON 2/27/2017; Reply due by 5:00 p.m. 2/28/2017. (mej)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch denying 124 Motion to Reconsider. (mej)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch denying 80 Motion to Compel; denying 81 Motion to Compel; denying 82 Motion to Compel; denying 84 Motion to serve additional requests for admission. (mej)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. Hearing set for 2/6/2017 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch. (mej)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part 52 "Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration of Dismissal of Carlos Restrepo with Prejudice and Possible Corruption of Ruling Delivered without Ever Appearing on the Record Doc 49, 50, 51." (tah)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thymes v. Verizon Wireless, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Gene Thymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Danny W. Jarrett
Represented By: Andrea K. Robeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Restrepo
Represented By: Danny W. Jarrett
Represented By: Andrea K. Robeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?