Anaya v. Hatch et al
Petitioner: Arturo Anaya
Respondent: Timothy Hatch and Attorney General of the State of New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2016cv00331
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Robert A. Junell
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez DENYING 52 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Petitioner Arturo Anaya's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal [Doc. 52 ] is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (gr)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 41 MOTION for New Trial; and DENYING 38 MOTION for Order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Petitioner Arturo Anaya's "Motion to U.S. District Judge on Prima Facie Evidence" [Doc. 38 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for New Trial [Doc. 41 ] is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (gr)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez DENYING 33 MOTION for Reconsideration. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Petitioner Arturo Anaya's Motion to U.S. District Judge on Joint Negligence [Doc. 33 ] is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (gr)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar as to 1 Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus. I RECOMMEND that Petitioner be given the option to withdraw his unexhausted claims and proc eed on the remaining claims. Objections to PF&RD are due by October 20, 2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (sg)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 12 Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (am)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Respondents must answer no later than June 5, 2017. (am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anaya v. Hatch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arturo Anaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?