De La Fuente Guerra v. Winter et al
Plaintiff: Roque De La Fuente Guerra
Defendant: Brad Winter
Case Number: 1:2016cv00393
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack Denying 55 MOTION for Reconsideration to Amend Judgement Pursuant to Rule 59(e). (jjs)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack GRANTING 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW (yc)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing denying as moot 42 Motion to Compel Discovery. (ccp)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing denying 44 Motion to Quash; denying 46 Motion to Quash. (ccp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Fuente Guerra v. Winter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roque De La Fuente Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?