State of New Mexico v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency, Gina McCarthy, Environmental Restoration, LLC, Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Inc and Sunnyside Gold Corporation
Case Number: 1:2016cv00465
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 774 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART SOVEREIGN PLAINTIFFS AND SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S MOTIONS FOR SANCTION DUE TO THE FEDERAL PARTIES' SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. The Sovereign Plaintiffs ' Motion for Sanctions due to the Federal Parties' Spoliation of Evidence, Doc. 1179 , is GRANTED in part. SGC's Motion for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(e), Doc. 1206 , is GRANTED in part. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (cmm)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 717 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, granting in part ( 1113 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Incorporated Memorandum in Support. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 710 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, Granting in Part 867 Kinross Gold Corporations's Motion for Summary Judgment on the United States' Crossclaims: Personal Jurisdiction Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 709 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, granting 866 Kinross Gold U.S.A. and Kinross Gold Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of New Mexico, The Navajo Nation, Utah, and the Allen Plaintiffs: Personal Jurisdiction Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 707 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. denying as moot SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON GROUNDS OF LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (597 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 868 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 226 in 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 489 in 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 393 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) (meq)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 696 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson Overruling the United States' Objections to the Special Mater's Order on New Mexico's Motion for Protective Order (649 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1004 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (meq)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 690 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, denying ( 876 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Dismiss New Mexico Plaintiff's Tort Claims for Lack of Standing. The State of New Mexicos Cross-Motion for Leave to Amend the Second Amended Complaint, Doc. 897 , filed November 5, 2020, is DENIED as moot. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF (meq)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 689 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting ( 1051 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Supplement Briefing on Personal Jurisdiction MSJs. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 671 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson denying ( 865 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss State of Utah and Environmental Restoration, LLC's Claims. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (meq)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 625 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, Overruling Objections to Special Master's Order. Related document(s): (589 in 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 844 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 386 in 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF) Objections,. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF (meq)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ON SUNNYSIDE GOLDS DUE POCESS COUNTERCLAIM by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. IT IS ORDERED that United States Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Sunnyside Golds Due Process Counter Claim 345 is GRANTED Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 444 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson denying (268 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (meq)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 422 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (271 in 1:18-md-02824-WJ) MOTION to Trifurcate Discovery and Trial filed by State of Utah, Joanna McDaniel, State of New Mexico, Navajo Nation, Joe C Allen by Special Master. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK, 1:19-cv-00708-WJ-JFR (meq)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting in part and denying in part 42 Defendants Sunnyside Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold U.S.A. Inc., and Kinross Gold Corporations Combined Motion to Dismiss and Supporting MemorandumAssociated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ (meq)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, IT IS ORDERED that EPA Contractor Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, Doc. 45 , filed July 25, 2018, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, denying 44 The Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Thereof, granting in part and denying in part 114 The Federal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum in Support. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02824-WJ, 1:16-cv-00465-WJ-LF, 1:16-cv-00931-WJ-LF, 1:17-cv-00710-WJ-SCY, 1:18-cv-00319-WJ, 1:18-cv-00744-WJ-KK (meq)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. IT IS ORDERED that: (i) Defendant United States of America's Motion to Temporarily Stat Proceedings Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation,[191 ], is GRANTED in part. (ii) New Mexico's Motion for Leave to File Amended Amended Complaint, 86 , is DENIED without prejudice. (iii) Plaintiff Navajo nations Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint andIncorporated Memorandum in Suppor t Thereof, 141 , is DENIED without prejudice.(iv) Defendant Sunnyside Gold Corporations Motion to Dismiss, 45 , is DENIED without prejudice. (v) Kinross Gold Corporation and Kinross Gold USA, Inc.s Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint for: (1) La ck of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2); (2) Failure to State a Claim pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6); and (3) Partial Joinder in Sunnyside Gold Corporations Motion to Dismiss, 46 , is DENIED without prejudice. (vi) Defendant EPAs Motion to Dismiss Complaints of Plaintiffs State of New Mexico and Navajo Nation and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Thereof, 126 , is DENIED without prejudice.(vii) The State of New Mexicos Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, 187 , is DENIED without prejudice. See Order for further deadlines. (kg)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge M. Christina Armijo granting in part and denying in part and holding in abeyance in-part 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and 101 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; 101 Motion to Strike (cab)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 80 MOTION to Expedite Decision on Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Motion to Strike,granting 99 MOTION to Strike 80 ; denying supplemental brief 88 ; modifying Court's Order issued on 12/6/16 by Chief Judge M. Christina Armijo. (vv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New Mexico v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Jordon P. George
Represented By: Cholla Khoury
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Restoration, LLC
Represented By: Terry D Avchen
Represented By: Terry Farmer
Represented By: Andriy Pazuniak
Represented By: Brittany M. Sayer
Represented By: Peter Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinross Gold Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinross Gold USA, Inc
Represented By: Bradford C. Berge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyside Gold Corporation
Represented By: Bradford C. Berge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?