Barela v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Anthony Barela
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2016cv00588
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: William P. Johnson
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson ADOPTING Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommended Disposition and dismissing this cause with prejudice. (mag)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea directing Defendant/Movant to file presentence report. (KRS) Modified text on 6/28/2017 (vrr)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea directing Defendant/Movant to file Presentence Report. (KRS)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255 under Johnson v. USA) filed by Anthony Barela. Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2017. Add 3 days to the dead line if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barela v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Barela
Represented By: Thomas B Jameson(Designation Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jack Burkhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?