Applied Capital, Inc v. The ADT Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Applied Capital, Inc
Defendant: The ADT Corporation, ADT, LLC and iControl Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00815
Filed: July 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
3 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 SECOND AMENDED PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation Pro Hac Vice Certification - ERIC C. RUSNAK (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
August 13, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation Pro Hac Vice Certification - RANJINI ACHARYA (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
August 12, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6599771 re: # 149 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roach Martin, Tiffany)
August 12, 2019 Filing 149 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation by Tiffany L Roach Martin on behalf of: Ranjini Acharya Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP 2550 Hanover StreetPalo Alto, CA 94304 (650) 233-4500 Fax (650) 233-4545 ranjini.acharya@pillsburylaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Roach Martin, Tiffany)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6599745 re: # 148 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roach Martin, Tiffany)
August 12, 2019 Filing 148 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation by Tiffany L Roach Martin on behalf of: Eric C. Rusnak Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP 1200 17th Street, NWWashington, DC 20036 (202) 663-8000 Fax (202) 663-8007 eric.rusnak@pillsburylaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Roach Martin, Tiffany)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tiffany L Roach Martin (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
August 12, 2019 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Senior United States District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon denying as moot #137 MOTION to preclude Expert Testimony and to Strike Untimely Claim Constructions Positions. (bap)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon denying DEFENDANT'S #123 Motion for Summary Judgment (bap)
June 28, 2019 Filing 144 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Status Conference held on 06/27/2019. (cm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Shore on behalf of Applied Capital, Inc (Shore, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough amending in part #89 Patent Scheduling Order: Pretrial Conference to be held 300 days after the Markman Order or as otherwise set by the Court. Trial to be held 310 days after the Markman Order or as otherwise set by the Court. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cm)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Order by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 06/27/2019 at 11:30 a.m. The purpose of this conference is to discuss setting a settlement conference. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929 [Access Code: 8865421] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 140 RESPONSE to Motion re #137 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and to Strike Untimely Claim Constructions Positions filed by Applied Capital, Inc. (Offor, Chijioke)
June 17, 2019 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on JUNE 14, 2019, before District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Court Reporter/Transcriber PAUL BACA, Telephone number 505-843-9241. Tape Number: N/A. Transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at https://www.nmd.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 6/24/2019. Redaction Request due 7/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2019.(pb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 139 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon: Markman Hearing held on 6/14/2019. (Court Reporter John DeLaRosa) (bap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 137 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and to Strike Untimely Claim Constructions Positions by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
June 13, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tiffany L Roach Martin (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
June 12, 2019 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #123 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memo in Support on Patent Eligibility Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting 133 Motion to Seal Document (kfg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 132 RESPONSE to Motion re #123 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memo in Support filed by Applied Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bruce Pitt, #2 Declaration of Jun Zheng, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C - REDACTED) (Offor, Chijioke)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re #102 Brief, filed by Applied Capital, Inc. Markman Hearing set for 6/14/2019 at 08:30 AM to 12:00 pm in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ORDER. NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kfg)
April 18, 2019 Filing 130 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States District Judge William P. Johnson no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ng)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough finding as moot #92 Motion to Overrule "Discrete Subparts" Objections To Interrogatories. (kc)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough finding as moot #90 Motion to Compel Compliance With F.R.C.P. 34. (kc)
April 17, 2019 Filing 127 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/17/2019. (kc)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #124 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due 05/15/2019; Defendants' Reply is due by 06/12/2019. (kc)
April 10, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation re #119 Order Regarding Discovery Status (Harrison, Jeremy)
April 10, 2019 Filing 124 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #123 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memo in Support by Applied Capital, Inc. (Abdi, Shukri)
April 3, 2019 Filing 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memo in Support by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ho Declaration, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
March 11, 2019 Filing 122 Applied Capital's REPLY to Claim Construction Brief re #102 Brief, filed by Applied Capital, Inc. (Chan, Alfonso)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough Granting Leave to Exceed Exhibit Page Limit on the Markman Briefs. By oral motion made at the Discovery Hearing held on 3/1/2019, the Court granted the parties' request to exceed the exhibit page limit on their respective Markman briefs. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough Setting Telephone Status Conference. Telephone Status Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties are to call Judge Yarbrough's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-808-6929, Access Code 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough Regarding Discovery. (kc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 118 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Discovery Hearing held on 3/1/2019. (kc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 117 ADT's RESPONSE Markman Brief re #102 Brief, filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
February 28, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6306831 re: # 116 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Applied Capital, Inc (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Chan, Alfonso)
February 28, 2019 Filing 116 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Applied Capital, Inc by Alfonso G Chan on behalf of: William D. Ellerman Shore Chan DePumpo LLP 901 Main Street, Suite 3300Dallas 2145939113 Fax 214-593-9111 wellerman@shorechan.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Chan, Alfonso)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE by Applied Capital, Inc Pro Hac Vice Certification - William D. Ellerman (Krukar, Richard)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #111 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew M. Howard terminated. (kc)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #110 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Russell J. DePalma terminated. (kc)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough Resetting Discovery Hearing. Discovery Hearing set for 2/13/2019 is VACATED and reset for 3/1/2019 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew M. Howard by Applied Capital, Inc. (Abdi, Shukri)
February 6, 2019 Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Russell J. DePalma by Applied Capital, Inc. (Abdi, Shukri)
February 6, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6268471 re: # 109 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Applied Capital, Inc (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Chan, Alfonso)
February 6, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6268442 re: # 108 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Applied Capital, Inc (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Chan, Alfonso)
February 6, 2019 Filing 109 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Applied Capital, Inc by Alfonso G Chan on behalf of: Chijioke E. Offor Shore Chan DePumpo LLP 901 Main Street, Suite 3300Dallas 2145939110 Fax 214-593-9111 coffor@shorechan.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Chan, Alfonso)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 108 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Applied Capital, Inc by Alfonso G Chan on behalf of: Samuel Joyner Shore Chan DePumpo LLP 901 Main Street, Suite 3300Dallas, Texas 75202 214-593-9110 Fax 214-593-9111 sjoyner@shorechan.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Chan, Alfonso)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #104 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Response Markman brief is due by 03/01/2019; Reply Mark brief is due 03/11/2019. (kc)
February 4, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE by Applied Capital, Inc Pro Hac Vice Certification - Samuel Joyner (Krukar, Richard)
February 4, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE by Applied Capital, Inc Pro Hac Vice Certification (Krukar, Richard)
February 4, 2019 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #101 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Applied Capital, Inc. (Chan, Alfonso)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough Setting Discovery Hearing. Discovery Hearing set for 2/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kc)
January 23, 2019 Filing 102 BRIEF Opening Claim Construction by Applied Capital, Inc (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alfonso G. Chan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Chan, Alfonso)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #100 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Opening Markman brief is due by 1/23/2019; Response is due by 2/15/2019; Reply is due by 2/25/2019. (kc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #89 Scheduling Order by Applied Capital, Inc. (Chan, Alfonso)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting 94 Motion to Seal. (kc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 98 RESPONSE to Motion re 94 MOTION to Seal [SEALED] filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
November 29, 2018 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion re #92 MOTION to Compel to Overrule "Discrete Subparts" Objections to Interrogatories filed by Applied Capital, Inc. (Howard, Andrew)
November 15, 2018 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION to Compel to Overrule "Discrete Subparts" Objections to Interrogatories filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
November 14, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE by Applied Capital, Inc Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Howard, Andrew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 MOTION to Compel Compliance with F.R.C.P. 34 filed by Applied Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Howard, Andrew)
November 1, 2018 Filing 92 MOTION to Compel to Overrule "Discrete Subparts" Objections to Interrogatories by Applied Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Howard, Andrew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion re #90 MOTION to Compel Compliance with F.R.C.P. 34 filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jackson Ho, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration) (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
October 12, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION to Compel Compliance with F.R.C.P. 34 by Applied Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Howard, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Howard, Andrew)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 AMENDED PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
August 29, 2018 Filing 87 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Status Conference held on 8/28/2018. (cm)
August 27, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE by Applied Capital, Inc re 67 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certify Good Standing for Paul Beeler (Krukar, Richard)
August 27, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE by Applied Capital, Inc re 68 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certify Good Standing for Shukri Abdi (Krukar, Richard)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Status Conference set for 8/28/2018 at 03:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties shall call Judge Yarbrough's "Meet Me" conference line at 505-348-2277 to connect to the proceedings.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
August 20, 2018 Filing 83 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Status Conference held on 8/20/2018. (cm)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting Status Conference for 8/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties shall call Judge Yarbrough's Meet Me line at 505-348-2277 to connect to the proceedings. (hm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 81 ANSWER to #78 Amended Complaint by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation.(Harrison, Jeremy)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #79 Motion to Amend Case Management Deadlines. (cm)
June 28, 2018 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #77 Scheduling Order by Applied Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chan, Alfonso)
June 14, 2018 Filing 78 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation., filed by Applied Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P, #2 Exhibit Q, #3 Exhibit R, #4 Exhibit S, #5 Exhibit T, #6 Exhibit U)(Chan, Alfonso)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
June 6, 2018 Filing 75 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 6/6/2018. (cm)
June 6, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE by Applied Capital, Inc re 66 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District Certify Good Standing for Andrew M. Howard (Chan, Alfonso)
May 24, 2018 Filing 73 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Applied Capital, Inc (Chan, Alfonso)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The scheduling conference set for 5/31/2018 is hereby VACATED and RESET for 6/6/2018 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 5/24/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2018 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
March 26, 2018 Filing 70 STIPULATED ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting #61 Motion to Lift Stay. (mag)
March 22, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell J. DePalma on behalf of Applied Capital, Inc (DePalma, Russell)
March 21, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5710353 re: # 68 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Applied Capital, Inc (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Chan, Alfonso)
March 21, 2018 Filing 68 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Applied Capital, Inc by Alfonso G Chan on behalf of: Shukri Abdi Shore Chan DePumpo LLP 901 Main Street, Suite 3300Dallas, TX 75202 214-593-9110 Fax 214-593-9111 sabdi@shorechan.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Chan, Alfonso)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 21, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5710339 re: # 67 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Applied Capital, Inc (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Chan, Alfonso)
March 21, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5710329 re: # 66 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Applied Capital, Inc (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Chan, Alfonso)
March 21, 2018 Filing 67 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Applied Capital, Inc by Alfonso G Chan on behalf of: Paul T. Beeler Shore Chan DePumpo LLP 901 Main Street, Suite 3300Dallas, TX 75202 214-593-9110 Fax 214-593-9111 pbeeler@shorechan.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Chan, Alfonso)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 66 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Applied Capital, Inc by Alfonso G Chan on behalf of: Andrew M. Howard Shore Chan DePumpo LLP 901 Main Street, Suite 3300Dallas, TX 75202 214-593-9110 Fax 214-593-9111 ahoward@shorechan.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Chan, Alfonso)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfonso G Chan on behalf of Applied Capital, Inc (Chan, Alfonso)
March 19, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Applied Capital, Inc re #61 MOTION Lift Stay re #59 Order Staying Case filed by Applied Capital, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A PTAB denies ADT's rehearing request) (Krukar, Richard)
March 16, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re #62 Response by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation (Roach Martin, Tiffany) Modified text on 3/19/2018 (kg).
March 14, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION Lift Stay re #59 Order Staying Case filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
February 28, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION Lift Stay re #59 Order Staying Case by Applied Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ADT's Rehearing Request) (Krukar, Richard)
February 14, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE by Applied Capital, Inc re #59 Order Staying Case Inter Partes Review - institution denied (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision denying institution of IPR) (Krukar, Richard)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson STAYING CASE pending resolution of AIA Review Number IPR2017-01825. (mag)
August 4, 2017 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Inter Partes Review by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Staying Discovery by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery is temporarily stayed pending briefing and resolution of Defendants' motion to stay proceedings. (cm)
July 20, 2017 Filing 56 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 7/20/2017. (cm)
July 13, 2017 Filing 55 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Applied Capital, Inc (Krukar, Richard) Modified text on 7/14/2017 (kg).
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson DISMISSING IControl Networks, Inc. (mag)
May 19, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to iControl Networks, Inc. by Applied Capital, Inc (Krukar, Richard)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #50 Motion to Extend Jurisdictional Discovery Deadlines. Joint status report due by 5/23/2017. Deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion to compel is extended until 5/23/2017. (cm)
May 8, 2017 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Unopposed Joint Motion to Reset Deadlines by iControl Networks, Inc.. (Mays, Christopher)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #48 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The parties' deadline to file a joint status report and Plaintiff's deadline to file a motion to compel are extended to 5/9/2017. (cm)
April 19, 2017 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Joint Motion To Reset Deadlines by Applied Capital, Inc. (Krukar, Richard)
April 13, 2017 Filing 47 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Status Conference held on 4/13/2017. (cm)
March 22, 2017 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Applied Capital, Inc of Jurisdictional Discovery Requests (Krukar, Richard)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
March 20, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation Pro Hac Vice Certification (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
March 20, 2017 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-5109234 re: # 43 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roach Martin, Tiffany)
March 20, 2017 Filing 43 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation by Tiffany L Roach Martin on behalf of: JACKSON HO K&L Gates, LLP 630 Hansen WayPalo Alto, CA 94304 650-798-6700 Jackson.Ho@klgates.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Roach Martin, Tiffany)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 8, 2017 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by iControl Networks, Inc. (Mays, Christopher)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Permitting Limited Jurisdictional Discovery by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Jurisdictional Discovery due by 5/2/2017. (cm)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Status Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 11:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929 [Code: 8865421] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
March 2, 2017 Filing 39 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Discovery Hearing held on 3/2/2017. (cm)
February 24, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE by Applied Capital, Inc re #35 Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Hearings Provisional Discovery Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Jurisdictional Discovery Requests) (Krukar, Richard)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically (cm)
February 21, 2017 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Hearing set for 3/2/2017 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The status conference set for 2/22/2017 is VACATED. (cm)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Status Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The purpose of this status conference is to discuss setting limited discovery deadlines and parameters. The parties are encouraged to confer regarding these issues prior to the status conference. The parties shall call Judge Yarbrough's "Meet Me" conference line at 505-348-2277 to connect to the proceedings.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; GRANTING Applied Capitals request for jurisdictional discovery and REFERRING to Magistrate Judge Steven Yarbrough, to determine discovery deadlines and handle discovery matters AS FURTHER DESCRIBED HEREIN. (mag)
January 19, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Applied Capital, Inc re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Icontrol Network's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by iControl Networks, Inc. (Krukar, Richard)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Court granted this Motion on 12/13/16 during telephonic status conference. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED. (mag)
December 22, 2016 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Icontrol Network's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Surreply filed by Applied Capital, Inc. (Krukar, Richard)
December 13, 2016 Filing 29 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge William P. Johnson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/13/2016. (Court Reporter Theresa Dubois) (kg)
November 30, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/13/2016 at 10:00 AM - 640 Judge William P. Johnson Chambers. The parties are to call the "meet-me-conference line" at (505) 348-2308. (mag)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 17, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Applied Capital, Inc re #25 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Applied Capital, Inc (Krukar, Richard)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #24 Motion to Vacate Initial Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Conference set for November 10, 2016 is VACATED. (cm)
October 18, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Applied Capital, Inc. (Krukar, Richard)
October 14, 2016 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Vacate #9 Initial Scheduling Order, by Applied Capital, Inc. (Krukar, Richard)
October 14, 2016 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Icontrol Network's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by iControl Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul Dawes (Supplemental), #2 Affidavit of Christopher D. Mays) (Mays, Christopher)
September 26, 2016 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Icontrol Network's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Applied Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A getpiper.com store, #2 Exhibit B piper store checkout, #3 Exhibit C Piper camera on Amazon.com, #4 Exhibit D Icontrol consumer products, #5 Exhibit E Krukar Declaration, #6 Exhibit F Icontrol Networks app, #7 Exhibit G Icontrol One app, #8 Exhibit H Piper Mobile app, #9 Exhibit I Piper terms and conditions, #10 Exhibit J Piper privacy policy, #11 Exhibit K Monitronics partnership announcement, #12 Exhibit L Monitronics' New Mexico dealers, #13 Exhibit M Monitronics Subpoena, #14 Exhibit N Icontrol terms and conditions, #15 Exhibit O Icontrol One customer login, #16 Exhibit P Shaw Declaration) (Krukar, Richard)
September 14, 2016 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by iControl Networks, Inc. (Mays, Christopher)
September 14, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation Pro Hac Vice Certification (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
September 13, 2016 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-4806313 re: # 19 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roach Martin, Tiffany)
September 13, 2016 Filing 19 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation by Tiffany L Roach Martin on behalf of: Michael E. Zeliger K & L Gates LLP 630 Hansen WayPalo Alto, CA 94304 650-798-6700 Michael.Zeliger@klgates.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Roach Martin, Tiffany)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 13, 2016 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-4806306 re: # 18 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roach Martin, Tiffany)
September 13, 2016 Filing 18 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation by Tiffany L Roach Martin on behalf of: Audrey Lo K & L Gates LLP 630 Hansen WayPalo Alto, CA 94304 650-798-6761 Audrey.Lo@klgates.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Roach Martin, Tiffany)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 13, 2016 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
September 12, 2016 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Applied Capital, Inc.(Roach Martin, Tiffany)
September 12, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Icontrol Network's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by iControl Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Affidavit of P Dawes in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) (Mays, Christopher)
September 12, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Mays on behalf of iControl Networks, Inc. (Mays, Christopher)
September 12, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. Smith on behalf of iControl Networks, Inc. (Smith, Ryan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Yoon on behalf of iControl Networks, Inc. (Yoon, James)
August 30, 2016 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (iam)
August 19, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE by ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation of Stipulation for Extension of Time to Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 11/3/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/29/2016. (cm)
August 5, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE by Applied Capital, Inc Stipulated Extension of Time for Icontrol to Answer (Krukar, Richard)
July 22, 2016 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Applied Capital, Inc. iControl Networks, Inc. served on 7/22/2016, answer due 8/12/2016. (Krukar, Richard)
July 22, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Applied Capital, Inc. The ADT Corporation served on 7/22/2016, answer due 8/12/2016. (Krukar, Richard)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Applied Capital, Inc. ADT, LLC served on 7/22/2016, answer due 8/12/2016. (Krukar, Richard)
July 18, 2016 Summons Issued as to ADT, LLC, The ADT Corporation, iControl Networks, Inc. (kdh)
July 14, 2016 Filing 4 Report re: patent/trademark/copyright, Mailed in complaint and report to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, PO Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450. (med)
July 14, 2016 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (med)
July 14, 2016 U.S. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and U.S. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (med)
July 13, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Applied Capital, Inc (Krukar, Richard)
July 13, 2016 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-4700758 re #1 Complaint, filed by Applied Capital, Inc (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Krukar, Richard)
July 13, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Applied Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(Krukar, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Applied Capital, Inc v. The ADT Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The ADT Corporation
Represented By: Audrey Lo
Represented By: Jackson Ho
Represented By: Jeremy K. Harrison
Represented By: Tiffany L Roach Martin
Represented By: Michael E. Zeliger
Represented By: Ranjini Acharya
Represented By: Eric C. Rusnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, LLC
Represented By: Audrey Lo
Represented By: Jackson Ho
Represented By: Jeremy K. Harrison
Represented By: Tiffany L Roach Martin
Represented By: Michael E. Zeliger
Represented By: Ranjini Acharya
Represented By: Eric C. Rusnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iControl Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Represented By: James C. Yoon
Represented By: Christopher D. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Applied Capital, Inc
Represented By: Samuel Joyner
Represented By: Paul Beeler
Represented By: Chijioke Offor
Represented By: Russell J. DePalma
Represented By: Shukri Abdi
Represented By: Richard H Krukar
Represented By: Luis M Ortiz
Represented By: Alfonso G Chan
Represented By: Andrew M. Howard
Represented By: William D Ellerman
Represented By: Michael W. Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?