Martinez v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: Saul Martinez
Defendant: Schlumberger Technology Corporation and Shlumberger Limited
Case Number: 1:2016cv00945
Filed: August 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Rio Arriba
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 111 Motion to Seal. (cbf)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 103 Motion to Continue Deadline. The parties now have until July 2, 2019 to notify the Court that the case has settled or file a proposed discovery plan for the merits of the case. (cbf)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (sls)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for May 21, 2018 at 02:30 PM. Joint Status Report due by May 14, 2018. (sls)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits 28 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint 23 is GRANTED. (mjr)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Finding Good Cause to Extend Issuance of Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. An initial scheduling order shall not issue prior to a ruling on Plaintiff's motion to amend (Doc. No. 23). (sls)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. (atc)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez GRANTING 54 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Surreply and DENYING without prejudice 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (atc)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 1/23/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. (atc)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez GRANTING 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery. Plaintiff shall complete the discovery and file his response to Defendant's Motion to dismiss 11 no later than February 6, 2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul Martinez
Represented By: Daniel M. Faber
Represented By: Don Foty
Represented By: John Anthony Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Represented By: Robert Lombardi
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Represented By: Samuel Zurik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shlumberger Limited
Represented By: Robert Lombardi
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Represented By: Samuel Zurik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?