Mancha v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Benito Mancha
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2016cv00961
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 23 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Briefing Schedule. Response is due by June 12, 2017. Reply is due by July 12, 2017. (am)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 20 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Response is due by May 12, 2017. Reply is due by June 12, 2017. (am)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal Administrative Record (am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mancha v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito Mancha
Represented By: Barbara Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?