Cordova v. State of New Mexico, et al.

Plaintiff: Louis T Cordova
Defendant: State of New Mexico, Eduardo Lopez, Carol Hilton and Deinna Dures
Case Number: 1:2016cv01144
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Referring Judge: William P Lynch
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting and denying in part 29 MOTION to Dismiss All Counts of the Complaint and Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; granting as to Counts I, II and III against defendant UNMH and Count VI as to all defendants; and denying in all other respects. (bap)
July 10, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch VACATING settlement conference set for 7/27/2017. (mej)
July 5, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 30 Motion to Stay Discovery. (mej)
June 23, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING as to 30 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Deinna Dures, State of New Mexico, Carol Hilton, Eduardo Lopez. (mej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordova v. State of New Mexico, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis T Cordova
Represented By: Michael E. Mozes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deinna Dures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?