Vann v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Rayvell Vann
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2016cv01204
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Paul Kelly
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. denying 25 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. (rt)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED ORDER by Circuit Judge Paul Kelly, Jr. overruling Mr. Vann's objections 15 , adopting the Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition of the Magistrate Judge 14 , denying Mr. Vann's § 2255 motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence 2 , and denying a certificate of appealability. (rt) Criminal case number in body of prior Amended Order 18 has been corrected.
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Rayvell Vann by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Objections to R&R due by 9/15/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (cbf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vann v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayvell Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?