Halford v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Talia Halford
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2016cv01267
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part 26 Motion for Attorney Fees by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Response due by 8/22/2017. Reply due by 9/5/2017. (atc)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's Motion is now due 6/9/17; Response due 8/8/17; Reply due 8/21/17. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halford v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talia Halford
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?