Walsh v. Schreier et al
Petitioner: Stanford Kelly Walsh
Respondent: Barbara Seidl Schreier and Attorney General of the State of New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2016cv01278
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Cibola
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Brack
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Robert C. Brack re 17 Report and Recommendations.; denying 18 Motion to Amend/Correct (yc) Modified on 9/21/2017 (yc).
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa re 1 Petition for 2254 Relief filed by Stanford Kelly Walsh. Objections to PFRD due by 9/13/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (kc) Modified document type on 8/31/2017 (am).
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa denying 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; denying 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct and denying 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct. (kc) Modified document type on 7/21/2017 (am).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Schreier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanford Kelly Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara Seidl Schreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?