Quintana-Quintana v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Quintana-Quintana
Defendant: Gurjant Singh and Day & Night Trucking Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv01350
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Sierra
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for 6/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 2nd Floor Conference Room 1 (203) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2017. Discovery due by 3/1/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 9/21/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due to Court by 7/23/2018. (cbf)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 9/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Counsel may attend in person by following the instructions in the order. Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2017. (cbf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintana-Quintana v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Quintana-Quintana
Represented By: David Ray Rosales
Represented By: David E. Shelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurjant Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day & Night Trucking Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?