Torres v. Marcantel et al
Plaintiff: Laybe Torres
Defendant: Gregg Marcantel, Dwayne Santistevan, Ralph Lucero and Tamara King
Case Number: 1:2016cv01352
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FILED IN ERROR***MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 5 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; denying as moot 16 Plaintiff's Third Motion Show Cause to Excuse Initial Partial Payment; and dismissing 1 Complaint. Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order in which to file an amended complaint that states a claim on which relief may be granted. (tah) Modified to add error text (duplicate entry) on 7/17/2017 (yc).
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales DENYING 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, AND DENYING AS MOOT 16 THIRD MOTION Show Cause to Excuse Initial Partial Payment (yc)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 13 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Marcantel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laybe Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Marcantel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Santistevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?