Serna v. Webster
Plaintiff: Emma Serna
Defendant: Margette Webster, David Webster, State of New Mexico, Clayton Crowley, Alex Chisholm, Carl Butkus, Cindy Molina, Alan Malott, Beatrice Brickhouse, Bobby Jo Walker, James O'Neal, Robert Bob Simon, Estate of Paul F. Becht, Carl A. Calvert, Joey Moya, Amy Mayer, Garcia Madeliene, Arthur Pepin, Monica Zamora, Cheryl Ortega, John Doe, Pat McMurray, Martha Murillo, Sally Galanter, New Mexico Construction Industries Division, Robert Unthank, Martin Romero and Amanda Roybal
Case Number: 1:2017cv00020
Filed: January 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: James O. Browning
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning adopting the Magistrate Judge's Third Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition 172 ; dismissing the case with prejudice; denying as moot the Defendants' Motion to Strike and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Plaintiff Sernas [sic] Motion for Leave to File a Surreply Objection to Dismiss & Strike Plaintiff's Complaint 148 ; and, imposing filing restrictions upon Plaintiff Emma Serna as set forth in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order Adopting the Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition at 91-92 153 (meq)
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning adopting the Magistrate Judge's Third Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition 172 ; dismissing the case with prejudice; denying as moot the Defendants' Motion to Strike and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Plaintiff Sernas [sic] Motion for Leave to File a Surreply Objection to Dismiss & Strike Plaintiff's Complaint 148 ; and, imposing filing restrictions upon Plaintiff Emma Serna as set forth in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order Adopting the Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition at 91-92 153 . (kw)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 168 MOTION Renewed Motion to Impose Filing Restrictions filed by Cindy Molina, Garcia Madeliene, Arthur Pepin, Cheryl Ortega, James O'Neal, Bobby Jo Walker, Alan Malott, Carl Butkus, Monica Zamora, Joey Moya, Nan Nash, Amy Mayer, Beatrice Brickhouse by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Objections to R&R due by 2/9/2018. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (mlt)
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning adopting the Second Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition 118 ; denying Plaintiff Serna's motions for default judgment 26 , 27 , 28 , 29 , 30 , 31 , 32 , 66 , 77 , 92 , 115 , 127 , 128 , 129 , 130 , 131 , 132 , 138 ; denying Serna's motions to amend 7 , 8 , 25 , 47 , 61 , 87 , 93 , 94 , 134 , 141 ; granting all motions to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b) 23 , 33 , 34 , 36 , 40 , [12 0]; denying Serna's motions for injunctive relief and for sanctions 11 , 20 , 21 , 24 , 58 , 91 , 94 , 96 , 98 , 104 , 105 , 121 , 123 , 125 , 126 , 140 , 141 , 144 , 145 , 146 ; granting Defendant Robert Simon's motion for more definite statement 38 ; denying Serna's requests for discovery devices 61 and 125 ; granting the Judicial Defendants' motion to strike (Doc. 84) Serna's unauthorized surreply 83 ; denying Serna's motion for leave to file surreply 90 ; dismissing Defendants Cindy Molina, Lynette Rodriguez, Madeline Garcia, Sally Galanter, and Ari Biernoff; granting the Judicial Defendants' motion for filing restrictions 99 ; Serna is ordered to show cause why filing restri ctions should not be imposed against her, as outlined above; denying Serna's motion for hearing 53 ; denying Simon's motion to strike and to dismiss 139 ; dismissing with prejudice all purported criminal claims against all Defendants; and, Serna will file one amended complaint as to Defendants Alex Chisholm, Estate of Becht, and Robert Simon within ten days from the date of entry of this Order. (kw)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning, the Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition, 103 is adopted; Serna & Associates Construction Co., LLC's, claims are dismissed without prejudice; and Serna & Associates is dismissed from this case. (meq)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch deferring ruling on 53 Motion for Hearing; granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 64 Motion to Substitute Attorney. ; denying 65 Motion to Dismiss Untimely Stay. (mej)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch as to Serna & Associates and LR 83.7. Objections to PFRD due by 4/26/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) Please note that the only correction to this document is the title. (dr)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting 37 Motion to Stay; granting 42 Motion to Stay. (mej)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serna v. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margette Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Crowley
Represented By: William David Greig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Chisholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Butkus
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Molina
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Malott
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatrice Brickhouse
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Jo Walker
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Neal
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bob Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Paul F. Becht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl A. Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Moya
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Mayer
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia Madeliene
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Pepin
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Zamora
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Ortega
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat McMurray
Represented By: Kenneth C. Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Murillo
Represented By: Kenneth C. Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Galanter
Represented By: Kenneth C. Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Construction Industries Division
Represented By: Kenneth C. Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Unthank
Represented By: Kenneth C. Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Romero
Represented By: Kenneth C. Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Roybal
Represented By: Kenneth C. Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?