Trujillo v. City of Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Trujillo
Defendant: City of Hobbs and Royal Hopper
Case Number: 1:2017cv00053
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by District Judge J. Thomas Marten granting 96 Motion to Dismiss. (crc)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Vacating 95 Telephonic Status Conference previously set for 9/8/2020 at 02:30 PM by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (crc)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER setting Telephonic Status Conference for 9/8/2020 at 02:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (crc)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 1/21/2020 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Court RECOMMENDS that 35 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED. Objections to the PF&RD are due by 9/23/2019. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (ag)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Court RECOMMENDS that 32 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be DENIED. Objections to PF&RD due by 9/5/2019. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (ag)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 3/13/2019 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Plaintiff's Motion, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d), for Limited Discovery by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Setting Telephonic Motion Hearing on 51 Plaintiff's Motion, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d), For Limited Discovery, by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for 9/24/2018 at 02:0 0 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER finding as moot 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Expert Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Stay of Discovery by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 31 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Extend Deadline to Disclose Experts by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's expert reports now due 8/25/17; Defendants' expert reports now due 9/25/17. (atc)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 8/22/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] The Settlement Conference is set for 8/31/2017 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 2nd Floor Conference Rooms 1 & 2 before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. City of Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Trujillo
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Represented By: Shannon L Kennedy
Represented By: Laura Schauer Ives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?