Lodestar Anstalt v. Route 66 Junkyard Brewery

Plaintiff: Lodestar Anstalt
Defendant: Route 66 Junkyard Brewery
Case Number: 1:2017cv00062
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF COUNTRY-
Presiding Judge: Judith C. Herrera
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera denying 113 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under the Unclean Hands Doctrine and Plaintiff's motion for costs and attorneys' fees under 28 U.S.C. § 1927 and the Court's inherent power as moved for in Response 117 . (baw)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 110 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order by District Judge Judith C. Herrera. (baw)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion to deem Levy Deposition Non-Confidential; granting 78 Motion for Protective Order. (mlt)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera denying 89 Plaintiffs Motion to Continue the Trial Date and granting 94 Defendants Motion to Strike Untimely Disclosed Experts unless the May 20, 2019 trial date is continued due to the Court's criminal docket. (baw)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera denying 47 Plaintiff Lodestar Anstalt's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and a Permanent Injunction and 56 Defendants Route 66 Junkyard Brewery LLC's and Henry Lackey's Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement. (baw)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter denying 67 Opposed Motion to reopen Discovery. (mlt)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch denying 37 Motion for Discovery. See Order for details. (mej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lodestar Anstalt v. Route 66 Junkyard Brewery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodestar Anstalt
Represented By: Jeffrey Albright
Represented By: Gerrit Warren Bleeker
Represented By: Bobbie Jo Collins
Represented By: Gary J. Nelson
Represented By: Steven Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Route 66 Junkyard Brewery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?