Royal v. Stripes, LLC
Plaintiff: Latoya Sh-Nae Royal
Defendant: Stripes, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00097
Filed: January 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Bernalillo
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER to Submit Closing Documents by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Closing documents are due to the Court by 3/19/2018. (atc)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 2/15/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be c onnected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. A Settlement Conference is set for 2/23/2018 at 10:30 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 1/18/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/11/2018 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Unopposed Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Discovery shall be completed by 12/30/17. Pretrial Motions are due by 1/30/18. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 4/21/18. (atc)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 9/14/2017 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [The parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Second Amended Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Attorneys Lauren Eileen Nutt and Lee Stringham terminated as counsel of record in this case. (atc)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying without prejudice 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 7/10/2017 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Jury Selection and Jury Trial will begin on 4/2/2018. (jlr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal v. Stripes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Sh-Nae Royal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stripes, LLC
Represented By: Agnes F. Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?