Ullrich v. Moldt et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Ullrich
Defendant: Adda Moldt and David River
Case Number: 1:2017cv00141
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Presiding Judge: Judith C. Herrera
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera Adopting Report and Recommendations 63 granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 32 (baw)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter denying 44 Motion for Leave to Supplement Response.
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David River, Adda Moldt by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2019. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (mlt)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P Lynch granting 6 Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint and ordering the Clerk to mail a notice and waiver of service forms with copies of the Amended Complaint and this order to Defendants. (jdm)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera granting 2 Motion to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 ( see document for specific instructions) and Dismissing 1 Complaint without prejudice with leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. (baw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ullrich v. Moldt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Ullrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adda Moldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David River
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?