Med Flight Air Ambulance, Inc. v. MGM Resorts International et al
Plaintiff: Med Flight Air Ambulance, Inc.
Defendant: MGM Resorts International and UMR, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00246
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: William P. Johnson
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 69 Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer to Cure Want of Jurisdiction, and Rule 60 Motion to Correct an Omission or for Other Reasons that Justify Relief AS FURTHER DESCRIBED HEREIN. (mag)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 71 Motion to Stay Discovery. The deadlines and Rule 16 conference date set forth in the parties' Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 68), are hereby vacated. (sls)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 12/21/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2017. (cbf)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson granting 21 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - First Amended ERISA Complaint filed in Federal Court (RENEWED) filed by MGM Resorts International. (rwg)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTRY OF RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Compel (cbf)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion for Discovery; denying as moot 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; and granting in part 24 Motion for Discovery by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION & ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea denying as moot 16 Motion for Discovery; denying as moot 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; and granting in part 24 Motion for Discovery (cbf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Med Flight Air Ambulance, Inc. v. MGM Resorts International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Med Flight Air Ambulance, Inc.
Represented By: J. Edward Hollington
Represented By: David M Houliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts International
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: Nury H Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Represented By: John C. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?