Armendariz et al v. Santa Fe County Board of Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Armendariz, Eric Dion Coleman, Jacob Gomez, Tony Lovato, Matthew J. Lucero, Edward R. Manzanares, Joe Martinez, Christopher Mavis, Philip Talachy, Felipe J. Trujillo and Joseph Vigil
Defendant: Santa Fe County Board of Commissioners and Mark Gallegos
Case Number: 1:2017cv00339
Filed: March 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING 125 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Santa Fe County Board of Commissioners and Mark Gallegos. (mag)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING 112 Defendants Santa Fe County Board of Commissioners and Mark Gallegos Motion to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Wheeler or, Alternatively, for an Order to Show Cause why Claims Should Not be Dismissed and/or Other Sanctions Imposed; DENYING 117 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Claims of Felipe Trujillo or, Alternatively, for an Order to Show Cause Why Claims Should Not Be Dismissed and/or Other Sanctions Be Imposed; and DENYING 127 Defendants' Expedited Motion to Dismiss Claims of Matthew Lucero or, Alternatively, for Order to Show Cause Why Claims Should Not Be Dismissed and/or Other Sanctions Be Imposed. (mag)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING 166 Motion for Reconsideration of Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Cause of Action. (mag)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING 124 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 112 Motion to Dismiss Party - the Claims of James Wheeler or, Alternatively, for Entry of Order to Show Cause Why the Claims of James Wheeler Should not be Dismissed and/or Other Sanctions. (mag)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING 65 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (mag)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing denying 37 Motion to Bifurcate Discovery. (ccp)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing denying 22 Motion for Entry of a "Lone Pine" Case Management Order. (ccp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armendariz et al v. Santa Fe County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Armendariz
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Dion Coleman
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Gomez
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Lovato
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Lucero
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward R. Manzanares
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Martinez
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Mavis
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Talachy
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe J. Trujillo
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Vigil
Represented By: John C. Bienvenu
Represented By: Mark H Donatelli
Represented By: Paul M Linnenburger
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?