CNSP, Inc. v. City of Santa Fe
Plaintiff: CNSP, Inc.
Defendant: City of Santa Fe
Case Number: 1:2017cv00355
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (tah)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply to the Motion to Dismiss Briefing. Plaintiff may file its surreply no later than 8/7/2019. (tah)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 3/20/2019 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 7 Defendant City of Santa Fe's Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss. (tah)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration on Order Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (tah)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CNSP, Inc. v. City of Santa Fe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNSP, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Hans Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Fe
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Represented By: R. Alfred Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?