Lovato v. San Juan County Adult Detention Center
Plaintiff: Jesus P. Lovato
Defendant: San Juan County Adult Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2017cv00544
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Brack
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack DISMISSING 11 Response re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Ginger Wheeler. (yc)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR PERSONAL SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. (sg)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack Re 11 RESPONSE re 10 Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed by Jesus P. Lovato (jjs)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack DISMISSING 1 Complaint; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order in which to file an amended complaint (yc)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by District Judge Robert C. Brack; The Plaintiff's civil right complait 1 is dismissed without prejudice (jn)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must make an initial partial payment, or show cause why his complaint should not be dismissed, by August 7, 2017. (sg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovato v. San Juan County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus P. Lovato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?