Gandy v. RWLS, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Rick Gandy
Defendant: RWLS, LLC and Matthew Gray
Case Number: 1:2017cv00558
Filed: May 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Judith C. Herrera
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SECOND INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. In light of the 65 Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion in Support of Rule 23 Class Certification, a second Joint Status Report sha ll be submitted by the parties no later than 5/15/2019. A Second Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 5/23/2019 at 2:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera granting in part 52 Defendants' Motion to Strike Part of Plaintiff's Motion in Support of Rule 23 Class Certification, granting 58 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave to File 1-Day Late Reply in Support of Class Certification and denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion in Support of Rule 23 Class Certification. (baw)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera denying 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual and Class Claims (baw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gandy v. RWLS, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RWLS, LLC
Represented By: Christian Antkowiak
Represented By: Ellen S. Casey
Represented By: Jaclyn M McLean
Represented By: Brian S. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Gray
Represented By: Ellen S. Casey
Represented By: Jaclyn M McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Gandy
Represented By: J. Derek Braziel
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Represented By: Jack L. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?