Maestas v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kathleen Regina Maestas
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2017cv00679
Filed: June 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Rio Arriba
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to Section 406(b) by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part 24 Motion for Attorney Fees by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINAL JUDGMENT by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Motion to Reverse or Remand now due 1/10/2018. Response due 3/9/2018. Reply due 3/23/2018. (atc)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Motion to Remand Due 12/11/2017. Response Due 2/9/2018. Reply Due 2/23/2018. (atc)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Directing Service by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maestas v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Regina Maestas
Represented By: Francesca J. MacDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?