Hunt et al v. Tri-State Care Flight, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lee Hunt and Pearl Yeast
Defendant: Tri-State Care Flight, LLC and Valerie Cavigneaux
Case Number: 1:2017cv00682
Filed: June 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez GRANTING 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum Brief. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Tri-State's Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (6) [Doc. 15 ], is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Complaint [Doc. 1-2] is dismissed pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until April 30, 2019, to file an amended complaint. (gr)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Martha Vazquez; DENYING 22 Motion to Remand. See Order for Specifics. (gr)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough regarding 22 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Objections to PFRD due by 12/18/2018. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (hm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt et al v. Tri-State Care Flight, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Hunt
Represented By: Kathleen J. Love
Represented By: Randi McGinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Yeast
Represented By: Kathleen J. Love
Represented By: Randi McGinn
Represented By: Michael Sievers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Care Flight, LLC
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Kenneth Januszewski
Represented By: Christina Katt
Represented By: William Katt
Represented By: John Loringer
Represented By: Gregory Alan Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Cavigneaux
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?