Hays v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Johnna Hays
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2017cv00700
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Sandoval
Presiding Judge: William P Lynch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera adopting Report and Recommendations 30 and granting Motion to Remand to Agency 25 . (baw)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa re 25 MOTION to Remand to Agency filed by Johnna Hays. Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2019. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (tkl)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge William P. Lynch granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion. Filing fee cannot be waived. Judgment of dismissal without prejudice will be entered by the Court upon receipt of the filing fee. (mej)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hays v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnna Hays
Represented By: Benjamin Eilers Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?