Diaz Jaramillo v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Yolanda Lorraine Diaz Jaramillo
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2017cv00859
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees. (sls)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting in part 19 Motion to Remand to Agency. (sls)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CONSENT DEADLINE by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. The parties are reminded that consent is strictly voluntary and there are no adverse consequences for withholding consent. Should the parties choose to consent, such consent shall be filed with the Court within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. (sls)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Briefing Schedule Filed 11/28/2017. Motion to Remand Due 12/29/2017. Response Due 2/1/2018. Reply Due 2/12/2018. (sls)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 10 Motion to Seal. (sls)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz Jaramillo v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Lorraine Diaz Jaramillo
Represented By: Michael D. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?