STC.UNM v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: STC.UNM
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated and Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. and Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Counter_defendant: STC.UNM
Case Number: 1:2017cv01123
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: M. Christina Armijo
Presiding Judge: Karen B. Molzen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADOPTING 72 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Martha Vazquez ; DENYING 10 Motion to Dismiss; and GRANTING 12 Motion to Remand. This matter is remanded to the Second Judicial District Court, County of Bernalillo, State of New Mexico. (gr)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Objections to R&R due by 3/22/2019. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (KBM)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez OVERRULING 39 Objections. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that STC.UNM's Objection to Order Permitting Limited Discovery (Doc. 38 ) [Doc. 39 ] is OVERRULED. (gr)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting in part 17 Defendants' Motion for Discovery but limiting discovery to a deposition of Elizabeth J. Kuuttila solely on the issue of Plaintiff's entitlement to immunity. (KBM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STC.UNM v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STC.UNM
Represented By: Deron B. Knoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: Debashree Nandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Represented By: Debashree Nandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: STC.UNM
Represented By: Deron B. Knoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?