Ortega v. New Mexico Legal Aid, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mina Ortega
Defendant: New Mexico Legal Aid, Inc., Ed Marks, Siempre Unidos En Progreso, UAW Local 2320 International United Auto Workers, Donis Borks, Gordon Deane, Alicia Clark and AFL-CIO
Case Number: 1:2018cv00111
Filed: February 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL UNION by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kmt)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel Additional Dates for Deposition Within Previously Set Time Limits (Doc. 228) is denied. (kmt)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER ON NMLA'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. NMLA's Emergency Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Good Faith Participation and for Declaration Regarding the Trial Deposition of Ed Marks on April 24 and 27, 2020 (Doc. 217) is granted in part and denied in part. (kmt)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING PARTIAL DISCOVERY STAY AND ALLOWING TRIAL DEPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings (Doc. 207) is granted in part and denied in part. NMLA's Motion to Allow NMLA to Take Trial Deposition of Ed Marks (Doc. 210) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Time to File Reply (Doc. 213) is denied. Case management deadlines are extended as described in the Order. (kmt)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order (Doc. 175) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Read and Sign Deposition (Doc. 179) is granted in part and denied in part. (kmt)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. New Mexico Legal Aid's Motion for a Protective Order (Doc. 103), Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to Union (Doc. 120), and Plaintiff& #039;s Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to NMLA (Doc. 121) are granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time for Deposition or Alternatively for Extension of Time to Take Depositions (Doc. 160) is granted in part, taken under advisement in part, and denied in part. (kmt)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER ON NMLA'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. NMLA's Motion to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff (Doc. 122) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff shall serve the required discovery responses by 12/2/2019. (kmt)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kmt)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Doc. 89) is denied. Plaintiff will be ordered to pay reasonable attorneys' fees Defendant incurred in responding to Plaintiff's motion. Defendant may submit an affidavit and request for attorneys' fees by 8/30/2019. (kmt)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Martha Vazquez; OVERRULING 59 Objections, filed by Siempre Unidos En Progreso, UAW Local 2320 International United Auto Workers; and DENYING 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File. See Order for Specifics. (gr)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ed Marks and filed by New Mexico Legal Aid, Inc., 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gordon Deane, Alicia Clark, Siempre Unidos En Progreso, UAW Local 2320 International United Auto Workers, Donis Borks, 47 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Mina Ortega, 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NMLA and filed by Ed Marks, 52 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Mina Ortega by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2019. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (tkl)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jdm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. New Mexico Legal Aid, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mina Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Legal Aid, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siempre Unidos En Progreso
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Represented By: Jeremy E. Meyer
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UAW Local 2320 International United Auto Workers
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Represented By: Jeremy E. Meyer
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donis Borks
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Represented By: Jeremy E. Meyer
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Deane
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Represented By: Jeremy E. Meyer
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Clark
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Represented By: Jeremy E. Meyer
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?