Channon v. Tavangar et al

Plaintiff: Matthew J Channon
Defendant: Armada Group, Inc, TP-LINK Research America Corporation, Jeff Tavangar, Shelley Baca, Natalie Gann and Jennifer Ireland
Case Number: 1:2018cv00596
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
0 Judge: Karen B Molzen
1 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2018 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew J Channon as to Armada Group, Inc. (kdh)
July 16, 2018 8 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to TP-LINK Research America Corporation, filed by Matthew J Channon. (ln)
July 11, 2018 7 CM/ECF Pro Se Notification form by Matthew J Channon electing to receive notification via E-Mail. (ln)
June 28, 2018 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
June 28, 2018 Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (mnb)
June 28, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (KBM)
June 26, 2018 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (mnb)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 26, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew J Channon. (mnb)
June 26, 2018 2 ***FILED IN ERROR*** PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb) Modified on 6/26/2018 to indicate filed in error; 1915 review notice issued(mnb).
June 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (mnb) Modified docket text on 6/27/2018 (ln).
June 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Armada Group, Inc, Shelley Baca, Natalie Gann, Jennifer Ireland, TP-LINK Research America Corporation, Jeff Tavangar, filed by Matthew J Channon. (mnb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Channon v. Tavangar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armada Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TP-LINK Research America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Tavangar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J Channon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?