Schiffmiller v. City of Santa Fe et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Schiffmiller
Defendant: The City of Santa Fe, Christopher Sandoval and City of Santa Fe
Case Number: 1:2018cv00736
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against all Defendant's, filed by Daniel Schiffmiller. (Eckert, Hope) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (gr).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #18 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. (mag)
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Daniel Schiffmiller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Eckert, Hope)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Settlement Conference for 2/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Pre-settlement Status Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Settlement statements are due to chambers on or before 2/4/2019. (mlt)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Motions due by 6/7/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2019. (mlt)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/18/2018. (mlt)
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 Joint Status Report /Provisional Discovery Plan by City of Santa Fe, Christopher Sandoval (Sullivan, James)
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Schiffmiller re #12 Certificate of Service (Amended) of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures on Defendants (Eckert, Hope)
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Schiffmiller of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures on Defendants (Eckert, Hope)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Santa Fe, Christopher Sandoval (Defendants' Initial Disclosures) (Sullivan, James)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 9/18/2018 at 03:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 9/11/2018. (mlt)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Santa Fe, Christopher Sandoval (Sullivan, James)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Santa Fe, Christopher Sandoval. (Sullivan, James)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Sullivan on behalf of All Defendants (Sullivan, James)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 3 and 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 1, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
August 1, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5950890 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The City of Santa Fe, Christopher Sandoval (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sullivan, James)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2018-01899. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Sullivan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schiffmiller v. City of Santa Fe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Schiffmiller
Represented By: Hope Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Santa Fe
Represented By: Christina L Brennan
Represented By: James P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Sandoval
Represented By: Christina L Brennan
Represented By: James P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Fe
Represented By: Christina L Brennan
Represented By: James P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?