Garcia et al v. City of Albuquerque et al
Plaintiff: Loretta Garcia
Defendant: Matthew Murphy, Andrew Wickline, Ronald Tosta, Ramon Ornelas, Benito Martinez, Gorden Eden, Jr., Armando Hernandez, City of Albuquerque, Michelle Campbell, Justice Bowe, Jason Saavedra, Victor Bustillos, Toby Gallegos, Raymond Marquez, Christopher Keeling and Dain Symes
Case Number: 1:2018cv00781
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Loretta Garcia, 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge,, filed by Christopher Keeling, Toby Gallegos, Jason Saavedra, Benito Martinez, Dain Symes, City of Albuquerque, Armando Hernandez, Michelle Campbell, Justice Bowe, Victor Bustillos, Matthew Murphy, Andrew Wickline, Gorden Eden, Jr., Ronald Tosta, Ramon Ornelas, Raymond Marquez. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Loretta Garcia voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kennedy, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 10/22/2018 at 03:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2018. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/2/2018. (bjp)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Justice Bowe, Victor Bustillos, Michelle Campbell, City of Albuquerque, Gorden Eden, Jr., Toby Gallegos, Armando Hernandez, Christopher Keeling, Raymond Marquez, Benito Martinez, Matthew Murphy, Ramon Ornelas, Jason Saavedra, Dain Symes, Ronald Tosta, Andrew Wickline voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Griffin, Stephanie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION by Justice Bowe, Victor Bustillos, Michelle Campbell, City of Albuquerque, Gorden Eden, Jr., Toby Gallegos, Armando Hernandez, Christopher Keeling, Raymond Marquez, Benito Martinez, Matthew Murphy, Ramon Ornelas, Jason Saavedra, Dain Symes, Ronald Tosta, Andrew Wickline (Griffin, Stephanie)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Justice Bowe, Victor Bustillos, Michelle Campbell, City of Albuquerque, Gorden Eden, Jr., Toby Gallegos, Armando Hernandez, Christopher Keeling, Raymond Marquez, Benito Martinez, Matthew Murphy, Ramon Ornelas, Jason Saavedra, Dain Symes, Ronald Tosta, Andrew Wickline. (Griffin, Stephanie)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number ALB040893 (jg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Justice Bowe, Victor Bustillos, Michelle Campbell, City of Albuquerque, Gorden Eden, Jr., Toby Gallegos, Armando Hernandez, Christopher Keeling, Raymond Marquez, Benito Martinez, Matthew Murphy, Ramon Ornelas, Jason Saavedra, Dain Symes, Ronald Tosta, Andrew Wickline re #2 Notice of Removal,, (Defendants Notice of Consent to Removal) (Griffin, Stephanie)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Justice Bowe, Victor Bustillos, Michelle Campbell, City of Albuquerque, Gorden Eden, Jr., Toby Gallegos, Armando Hernandez, Christopher Keeling, Raymond Marquez, Benito Martinez, Matthew Murphy, Ramon Ornelas, Jason Saavedra, Dain Symes, Ronald Tosta, Andrew Wickline (Griffin, Stephanie)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Second Judicial District Court of New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2018-04075. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffin, Stephanie)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M Griffin on behalf of All Defendants (Griffin, Stephanie)
August 15, 2018 Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (mnb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. City of Albuquerque et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Murphy
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wickline
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Tosta
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Ornelas
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benito Martinez
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorden Eden, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Hernandez
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Campbell
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Bowe
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Saavedra
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Bustillos
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Gallegos
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Marquez
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Keeling
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dain Symes
Represented By: Stephanie M Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Garcia
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?