International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers et al v. Board of County Commissioners of Sandoval County, New Mexico

Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers and United Food and Commercial Workers
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Sandoval County, New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2018cv00807
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: New Mexico District Court
0 Judge: Laura Fashing
1 Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
2 Judge: Kelly H Rankin
3 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2018 6 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Plaintiffs re #3 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, United Food and Commercial Workers (Youtz, Shane)
September 7, 2018 5 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, United Food and Commercial Workers. (Youtz, Shane)
September 6, 2018 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Board of County Commissioners of Sandoval County, New Mexico. (Burke, Sonya)
August 27, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court (anl)
August 23, 2018 United States District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal and United States Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin assigned. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to case. (ng)
August 23, 2018 3 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, United Food and Commercial Workers. (Youtz, Shane)
August 22, 2018 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
August 22, 2018 Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (mnb)
August 22, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5985682 re #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Board of County Commissioners of Sandoval County, New Mexico (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burke, Sonya)
August 22, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Board of County Commissioners of Sandoval County, New Mexico from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1329-CV-2018-00423. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Board of County Commissioners of Sandoval County, New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit B-1, #9 Exhibit B-2, #10 Exhibit B-3, #11 Exhibit B-4, #12 Exhibit B-5, #13 Exhibit B-6, #14 Exhibit B-7, #15 Exhibit B-8, #16 Exhibit B-9, #17 Exhibit B-10, #18 Exhibit B-11, #19 Exhibit B-12, #20 Exhibit B-13, #21 Exhibit B-14, #22 Exhibit B-15, #23 Exhibit B-16, #24 Exhibit B-17, #25 Exhibit B-18, #26 Exhibit B-19, #27 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Sonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers et al v. Board of County Commissioners of Sandoval County, New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Sandoval County, New Mexico
Represented By: Sonya R. Burke
Represented By: Nathan T Nieman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?