Hernandez Concrete Pumping, Inc. v. Duquette et al
Plaintiff: Hernandez Concrete Pumping, Inc.
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company and Raymond Albert Duquette, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv00840
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa Setting Rule 16 Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Telephone Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's "Meet Me" conference line at (505) 348-2347 to connect to the proceedings. (kc)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa Adopting Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan With Changes and Setting Case Management Deadlines. Discovery due by 2/15/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 12/17/2018; Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 01/15/2019; Discovery Motions due by 03/07/2019; Pretrial Motions due by 3/18/2019; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/3/2019; Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2019. (kc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 10/22/2018. (kc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACE American Insurance Company, Raymond Albert Duquette, III First Amended Disclosures (Richards, Lance)
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 Joint Status Report by ACE American Insurance Company, Raymond Albert Duquette, III (Richards, Lance)
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACE American Insurance Company, Raymond Albert Duquette, III Initial Disclosures (Richards, Lance)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by ACE American Insurance Company re #13 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay filed by ACE American Insurance Company (Richards, Lance)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay by ACE American Insurance Company. (Richards, Lance)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ACE American Insurance Company (Richards, Lance)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Dean Richards on behalf of ACE American Insurance Company (Richards, Lance)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent ACE American Insurance Company Pennsylvania corporation owned by INA Holdings Corporation for ACE American Insurance Company. (Richards, Lance)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ACE American Insurance Company. (Richards, Lance)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Raymond Albert Duquette, III (Richards, Lance)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 10/12/2018. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's "Meet Me" conference line at (505) 348-2347 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/25/2018. (kc)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Raymond Albert Duquette, III (Richards, Lance)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Raymond Albert Duquette, III. (Richards, Lance)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Dean Richards on behalf of Raymond Albert Duquette, III (Richards, Lance)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Raymond Albert Duquette, III from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2018-05312. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Raymond Albert Duquette, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Richards, Lance)
September 4, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6008411 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Raymond Albert Duquette, III (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Richards, Lance)
September 4, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez Concrete Pumping, Inc. v. Duquette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance Dean Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Albert Duquette, III
Represented By: Lance Dean Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernandez Concrete Pumping, Inc.
Represented By: Richard W Sutten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?