United States of America v. 94.594 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in Bernalillo County, State of New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 94.594 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in Bernalillo County, State of New Mexico and Western Albuquerque Land Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00877
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Western Albuquerque Land Holdings, LLC Rule 7.1 parent entity disclosure (Leverick, Richard)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Western Albuquerque Land Holdings, LLC (Leverick, Richard)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Bernalillo County Tax Assessor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kastner, Daniel)
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 United States' RESPONSE to Defendant Western Albuquerque Land Holdings, LLC's Answer re #1 Complaint, #10 Answer to Complaint, filed by United States of America. (Kastner, Daniel)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Western Albuquerque Land Holdings, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by United States of America, #3 Notice of Condemnation filed by United States of America.(Leverick, Richard)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by United States of America of Filing of U.S. District Court Receipt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt) (Kastner, Daniel)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Western Albuquerque Land Holdings, LLC as to Western Albuquerque Land Holdings, LLC. (Leverick, Richard)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Leverick on behalf of Western Albuquerque Land Holdings, LLC (Leverick, Richard)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa Directing the Clerk of Court to Deposit Funds at interest. (tkl)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
September 18, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Deposit Funds by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kastner, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION , filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Schedule B, #3 Schedule C, #4 Schedule D, #5 Schedule E, #6 Schedule F, #7 Schedule G)(Kastner, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Taking by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Schedule B, #3 Schedule C, #4 Schedule D, #5 Schedule E, #6 Schedule F, #7 Schedule G) (Kastner, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 94.594 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in Bernalillo County, New Mexico, Bernalillo County Tax Assessor, Western Albuquerque Land Holdings, LLC ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taking, #2 Schedule A, #3 Schedule B, #4 Schedule C, #5 Schedule D, #6 Schedule E, #7 Schedule F, #8 Schedule G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastner, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 94.594 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in Bernalillo County, State of New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 94.594 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situated in Bernalillo County, State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Albuquerque Land Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Leverick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel W Kastner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?