Kearney v. Unsecured Creditors Committee et al

Appellee: Unsecured Creditors Committee, Benjamin Abruzzo and Louis Abruzzo
Appellant: Victor P Kearney
Case Number: 1:2018cv00888
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: James O Browning
1 Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (mm)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt by District Judge James O. Browning (vv)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Benjamin Abruzzo, Louis Abruzzo Regarding Judge Malott's Retirement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Edelman, Spencer)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION to Expedite stay pending appeal filed by Victor P Kearney. (Domenici, Pete)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION to Expedite stay pending appeal filed by Benjamin Abruzzo, Louis Abruzzo, Mary Pat Abruzzo, Nancy Abruzzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Fish, Paul)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION to Expedite stay pending appeal filed by Unsecured Creditors Committee. (Pierce, Chris)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary T. Torres on behalf of Mary Pat Abruzzo, Nancy Abruzzo, Rico Abruzzo (Torres, Mary)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE and granting #3 Motion to Expedite by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The Court hereby ORDERS Appellees to RESPOND to the Motion no later than 12:00 p.m. on Monday, October 15, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Appellant may file an optional reply no later than 12:00 p.m. on Tuesday, October 16, 2018. (kdj)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION to Expedite stay pending appeal by Victor P Kearney. (Domenici, Pete)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Gregory J Fouratt by District Judge James O. Browning (vv)
September 20, 2018 United States District Judge James O. Browning and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (ln)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 Clerk's Certificate of Service Notice of Appeal and Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Court by U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Butler, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearney v. Unsecured Creditors Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Unsecured Creditors Committee
Represented By: Chris W. Pierce
Represented By: Thomas D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Benjamin Abruzzo
Represented By: Paul M. Fish
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Louis Abruzzo
Represented By: Paul M. Fish
Represented By: Spencer L Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Victor P Kearney
Represented By: Marcus A. Helt
Represented By: Debbie E. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?