Ski Development NM LLC et al v. People's Trust Federal Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Ski Development NM LLC, Gabe Bethel and Bethel Financial Direction LLC
Defendant: Saddleback Ranch Estates LLC, People's Trust Federal Credit Union and National Credit Union Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv00952
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
0 Judge: Laura Fashing
1 Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: James A Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 20 Letter by U.S. District Court addressed to the First Judicial District Court of New Mexico, Santa Fe County. (ng)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to the National Credit Union Administration Only by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. All claims as to Defendant National Credit Union Administration only are dismissed without prejudice, with all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses to be borne by each party incurring the same. The case shall be remanded back to the First Judicial District Court of the State of New Mexico. (kmt)
November 27, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Ski Development NM LLC (Stranahan, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by People's Trust Federal Credit Union. (Burton, John)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The telephonic scheduling conference set for 12/04/2018 at 1:30 p.m. shall be conducted on the Court's AT&T Connect Conference line. The parties should call (877) 848-7030 and use Code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 14 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # SF003073 re: 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant Saddleback Ranch Estates LLC. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Saddleback Ranch Estates LLC of Certificate of Good Standing (Sommer, Karl)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 Defendant Saddleback Ranch Estates. LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Saddleback Ranch Estates LLC. (Sommer, Karl)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Saddleback Ranch Estates LLC by Karl H Sommer on behalf of: James B. Ewbank, III COKINOS | YOUNG 900 S. Capital of Texas Highway, Suite 425Austin, Texas 78746 512 476-1080 Fax 512 610-1184 jewbank@cokinoslaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Sommer, Karl)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Burton on behalf of People's Trust Federal Credit Union (Burton, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant National Credit Union Administration's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by National Credit Union Administration. (Glenn, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by National Credit Union Administration of Certificate of Good Standing (Glenn, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6096396 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Credit Union Administration (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Glenn, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant National Credit Union Administration by Mark A. Glenn on behalf of: Raymond L. Panneton Hendershot, Cannon & Hisey 1800 Bering Drive, Suite 600Houston, TX 77057 713-783-3110 Fax 713-783-2809 rpanneton@hchlawyers.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Glenn, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 23, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6095064 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Credit Union Administration (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Glenn, Mark)
October 23, 2018 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6094960 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Credit Union Administration (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Glenn, Mark)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant National Credit Union Administration by Mark A. Glenn on behalf of: Simon Wesley Hendershot Hendershot, Cannon & Hisey 1800 Bering Drive, Suite 600Houston, TX 77057 713-783-3110 Fax 713-783-2809 trey@hchlawyers.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Glenn, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant National Credit Union Administration by Mark A. Glenn on behalf of: Katherine Tempone Cowart Hendershot, Cannon & Hisey 1800 Bering Drive, Suite 600Houston, TX 77057 713-783-3110 Fax 713-783-2809 kcowart@hchlawyers.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Glenn, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 11/26/2018. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call Judge Khalsa's "Meet Me" conference line at (505) 348-2347 to connect to the proceedings. Upon receipt of this Initial Scheduling Order, Plaintiff shall serve a copy of the Order on any parties that have been served but have not yet entered an appearance in this matter, and shall file a Certificate of Service with the Court documenting such service. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Initial Scheduling Order on any parties not yet served along with the summons and complaint. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/29/2018. (kc)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet by National Credit Union Administration (Glenn, Mark)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
October 12, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)
October 12, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6077928 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by National Credit Union Administration (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Glenn, Mark)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Credit Union Administration from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2018-02616. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by National Credit Union Administration. (Glenn, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ski Development NM LLC et al v. People's Trust Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saddleback Ranch Estates LLC
Represented By: James B Ewbank, II
Represented By: Karl H Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People's Trust Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Charles R Hughson
Represented By: John P. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Union Administration
Represented By: Mark A. Glenn
Represented By: Simon Hendershot, III
Represented By: Katherine Tempone Cowart
Represented By: Raymond L. Panneton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ski Development NM LLC
Represented By: Robert A Stranahan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabe Bethel
Represented By: Robert A Stranahan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethel Financial Direction LLC
Represented By: Robert A Stranahan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?