Green v. Bowen, et al.
Petitioner: Brant Green
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of New Mexico and Mark Bowen
Case Number: 1:2018cv00953
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SF003070. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Letter to North Eastern NM Correction Facility re; return of filing fee. (mjr)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brant Green. (gr)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw Request to Hold Petition in Abeyance by Brant Green. (gr)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Cure Defects Cure Deficiency by 11/16/2018. by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (tkl)
October 12, 2018 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Brant Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(gr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Bowen, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brant Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?