Cruz v. Lovelace Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eldie L. Cruz
Defendant: AHS Albuquerque Holdings, LLC, Lovelace Health System, Inc., BHC Management Services of New Mexico, LLC, AHS New Mexico Holdings, Inc., Ardent Health Services, Inc., AHS Management Company, Inc., Ardent Health Servies, Ardent Health Services, LLC, Lovelace Medical Group, Lovelace Health System and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00974
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Karen B Molzen
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss By Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company filed by Eldie L. Cruz. (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Brief in Support By Lovelace Health System, Inc. filed by Eldie L. Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 43 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #42 Response to Motion to Dismiss by AHS Medical Holdings, LLC For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Eldie L. Cruz (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum In Support By AHS Medical Holdings, LLC For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Eldie L. Cruz. (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum In Support By AHS Management Company, Inc., AHS Albuquerque Holdings, LLC, and AHS Medical Holdings, LLC filed by Eldie L. Cruz. (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Non-Entity "Ardent Health Services" and Memorandum in Support filed by Eldie L. Cruz. (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM By BHC Management Services of New Mexico, LLC filed by Eldie L. Cruz. (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by Eldie L. Cruz re #30 Joinder, Response To Notice Of Joinder By BHC Management Services of New Mexico, LLC (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE by Eldie L. Cruz re #22 Notice (Other),, Response To Notice Of Joinder By Lovelace Health System, Inc. (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File To Exceed Page Limits For Exhibits by Eldie L. Cruz. (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Strike #11 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Eldie L. Cruz. (Voorhis, Lisa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE by AHS Albuquerque Holdings, LLC, AHS Management Company, Inc., AHS New Mexico Holdings, Inc., Ardent Health Services, Inc., Ardent Health Services, LLC, Ardent Health Servies re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum In Support (Boyd, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AHS Albuquerque Holdings, LLC, AHS Management Company, Inc., AHS New Mexico Holdings, Inc., Ardent Health Services, Inc., Ardent Health Servies (Boyd, James)
December 13, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 23, 24, 25 and 28. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
December 11, 2018 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BHC Management Services of New Mexico, LLC (Stewart, M.)
December 11, 2018 Filing 30 JOINDER to #11 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum In Support, #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Brief in Support joined by Defendant BHC Management Services of New Mexico, LLC. (Stewart, M.)
December 11, 2018 Filing 29 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 5 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (eh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 26 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by Lovelace Health System, Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Medical Group re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #15 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Non-Entity "Ardent Health Services" and Memorandum in Support, #11 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum In Support, #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Brief in Support Joinder in Motions (Clark, Patrick)
December 4, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by AHS Albuquerque Holdings, LLC, AHS Management Company, Inc., AHS New Mexico Holdings, Inc., Ardent Health Services, Inc., Ardent Health Services, LLC, Ardent Health Servies re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Non-Entity "Ardent Health Services" and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Hanson, Robert)
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Walker Boyd on behalf of AHS Albuquerque Holdings, LLC, AHS Management Company, Inc., AHS New Mexico Holdings, Inc., Ardent Health Services, Inc., Ardent Health Services, LLC, Ardent Health Servies (Hanson, Robert) Modified on 12/6/2018 to correct atty name(mnb).
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Hanson on behalf of AHS Albuquerque Holdings, LLC, AHS Management Company, Inc., AHS New Mexico Holdings, Inc., Ardent Health Services, Inc., Ardent Health Services, LLC, Ardent Health Servies (Hanson, Robert)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum In Support by Ardent Health Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hanson, Robert)
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum In Support by AHS Albuquerque Holdings, LLC, AHS Management Company, Inc., AHS New Mexico Holdings, Inc., Ardent Health Services, Inc., Ardent Health Services, LLC, Ardent Health Servies. (Hanson, Robert)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Non-Entity "Ardent Health Services" and Memorandum in Support by Ardent Health Services, Inc., Ardent Health Services, LLC. (Hanson, Robert)
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lovelace Health System, Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Medical Group (Clark, Patrick)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Brief in Support by Lovelace Health System, Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - EEOC Charge) (Clark, Patrick)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BHC Management Services of New Mexico, LLC. (O'Neil, Meghan)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sweeney, Scott)
November 27, 2018 Hearing set for 1/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (hm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting 2 Motion to Seal 1 Complaint and setting Hearing on 1/15/2019 at 2:00 pm. (hm)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. (kc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick F Clark on behalf of Lovelace Health System, Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Medical Group (Clark, Patrick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lovelace Health System, Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Clark, Patrick)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by BHC Management Services of New Mexico, LLC of Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint (Stewart, M.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Eliza Stewart on behalf of BHC Management Services of New Mexico, LLC (Stewart, M.)
October 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to AHS Albuquerque Holdings, LLC, AHS Management Company, Inc., AHS New Mexico Holdings, Inc., Ardent Health Services, Inc., Ardent Health Services, LLC, Ardent Health Servies, BHC Management Services of New Mexico, LLC, Lovelace Health System, Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Medical Group, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (kdh)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee Received: Paid online $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6089257 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
October 19, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Lovelace Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHS Albuquerque Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Hanson
Represented By: James Walker Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovelace Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick F Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHC Management Services of New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Meghan O'Neil
Represented By: M. Eliza Stewart
Represented By: Jacqueline A Olexy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHS New Mexico Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Hanson
Represented By: James Walker Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardent Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Hanson
Represented By: James Walker Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHS Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Hanson
Represented By: James Walker Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardent Health Servies
Represented By: Robert E. Hanson
Represented By: James Walker Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardent Health Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Hanson
Represented By: James Walker Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovelace Medical Group
Represented By: Patrick F Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovelace Health System
Represented By: Patrick F Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldie L. Cruz
Represented By: Lisa L Voorhis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?